Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1271
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1271
Title:Timothy K. Moore, in His Official Capacity as Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rebecca Harper, et al.
Docketed:March 21, 2022
Linked with 21A455, 22A289, 22A385
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(413PA21)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2022Application (21A455) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Response to application (21A455) requested by The Chief Justice, due by 5 p.m. on Wednesday, March 2, 2022.
Feb 25 2022Letter dated February 25, 2022 from counsel for applicants filed.
Main Document
Mar 02 2022Response to application from State Respondents filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 02 2022Response to application from respondents Rebecca Harper, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Response to application from respondent Common Cause filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Response to application from respondents North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by National Republican Redistricting Trust.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Republican National Committee, NRCC, North Carolina Republican Party.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Reply of applicants Timothy Moore, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Application (21A455) referred to the Court.
Mar 07 2022Application (21A455) denied by the Court. Justice Kavanaugh concurring in the denial of the application for stay. (Detached opinion). Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas and Justice Gorsuch join, dissenting from the denial of the application for stay. (Detached opinion).
Mar 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2022 to June 20, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2022.
Apr 20 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Redistricting Trust filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of respondents North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2022Brief of respondents State Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of respondent Common Cause in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief of respondents Rebecca Harper, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2022Reply of petitioners Timothy Moore, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jul 19 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 19, 2022.
Jul 25 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Common Cause
Blanket Consent
Jul 26 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, State Respondents
Blanket Consent
Aug 04 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 09 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Rebecca Harper, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 29 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Timothy Moore, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Brief of petitioners Timothy Moore, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Amicus brief of White House Watch, a project of United States Public Policy Council et al. (including 33 Individuals) not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted September 02, 2022)
Aug 31 2022Brief amici curiae of White House Watch, a project of United States Public Policy Council, et al. filed.(File Date Corrected.)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Restoring Integrity and Trust in Elections, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Senator Kim Ward, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Wisconsin Voter Alliance, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Hon. John R. Ashcroft filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Taxpayers For Honest Elections filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of The American Legislative Exchange Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of APA Watch filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Redistricting Trust filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Republican National Committee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of America First Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Conference of Chief Justices in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Group of New York Voters in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Lawyers Democracy Fund and State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Honest Elections Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of America's Future, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Timothy Moore, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 30 2022Application (22A289) of non-state respondents to file a consolidated response brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 03 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Oct 07 2022Application (22A289) granted by The Chief Justice to file a consolidated respondents' brief on the merits in excess of the word limit provided that the brief does not exceed 20,000 words..
Oct 18 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 7, 2022.
Oct 19 2022Brief of state respondents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2022Consolidated brief of non-state respondents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2022Brief amici curiae of Thomas Griffith, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of Stephen M. Shapiro filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of Michael L. Rosin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors Akhil Reed Amar, Vikram David Amar and Steven Gow Calabresi filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Puerto Rico House of Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Richard L. Hasen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Campaign Legal Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Charles Plambeck and Joni Walser filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Local Government Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022CIRCULATED.
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Current and Former Election Officials Donetta Davidson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Law Forward, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Amicus brief of U.S. Senator Amy Klobuchar, et al. not accepted for filing. (October 27, 2022 - corrected brief to be submitted)
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the Founding Era filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia, Illinois, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of FairDistricts Now filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Gov. Arnold Schwarzenegger filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Derek T. Muller filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Group of Former Public Officials, Former Judges, and Election Experts From Pennsylvania filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Scholars of State Constitutional Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Evan Bernick filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Benjamin L. Ginsberg filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Women4Change Indiana, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of League of Women Voters of the United States and Leagues of Women Voters Representing 50 States and the District Of Columbia filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Carolyn Shapiro, Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos, Daniel P. Tokaji filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Republican Elected and Executive Branch Officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of The Anti-Defamation League, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Counties, The National League of Cities, The U.S. Conference of Mayors, The International City/County Management Association, and The International Municipal Lawyers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of William M. Treanor filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of State Constitutional Historians Lawrence Friedman and Robert F. Williams filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of The Making Every Vote Count Foundation and The Leadership Now Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers Defending American Democracy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of North Carolina Senator Daniel T. Blue, Jr. and North Carolina Representative Robert T. Reives, II filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Motion for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed by the respondents.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Human Rights Watch filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Retired Four-Star Admirals and Generals, and Former Service Secretaries of the U.S. Armed Forces filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Boston University Center for Antiracist Research and Professor Atiba R. Ellis filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Democracy and Race Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of The Lawyers’ Committee For Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of ServiceOther
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Election Administrators filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Secretaries of State of Colorado, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Senator Amy Klobuchar, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Eugene H. Goldberg filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2022Amicus brief of U.S. Senator Sheldon Whitehouse and Representative Henry “Hank” Johnson, Jr. not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief and file to be submitted.)
Oct 26 2022Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senator Sheldon Whitehouse, et al. filed. (12/06/2022) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2022Application (22A385) to file a reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limitation, not to exceed 11,000 words, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 28 2022Record requested from the Supreme Court of North Carolina.
Nov 01 2022Record received from the Supreme Court of North Carolina. The record is electronically filed.
Nov 03 2022Application (22A385) granted by The Chief Justice to file a reply brief on the merits in excess of the word limitation, not to exceed 11,000 words.
Nov 07 2022Motion for divided argument filed by respondents GRANTED.
Nov 07 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Nov 18 2022Reply of petitioners Timothy Moore, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2022Argued. For petitioners: David H. Thompson, Washington, D. C. For private respondents: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C. For state respondents: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae, supporting respondents: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Dec 21 2022Letter from petitioners and respondents giving notice of the December 16, 2022 decision of the North Carolina Supreme Court in Harper v. Hall (No. 413PA21) filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOther

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Timothy Moore, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc.
Richard Douglas Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
1875 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

rbernsteinlaw@gmail.com
3017752064
Party name: Thomas Griffith, John Danforth, Larry Thompson, Barbara Comstock, Peter Keisler, Stuart Gerson, et al.
Sarah Gardner Boyce
    Counsel of Record
NC Department of Justice
Post Office Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

sboyce@ncdoj.gov
9197166400
Party name: State Respondents
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Common Cause
Abha Khanna
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Rebecca Harper, et al.
Zachary Charles SchaufJenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: North Carolina League of Conservation Voters, Inc.
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: State Respondents
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States
John Christian Adams
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington St.
Suite 1675
Indianapolis, IN 46204

adams@publicinterestlegal.org
317-203-5599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Vikram David Amar
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
504 East Pennsylvania Avenue
Champaign, IL 61820

amar@illinois.edu
(217) 244-8446
Party name: Professors Akhil Reed Amar, Vikram David Amar and Steven Gow Calabresi
Mel Barnes
    Counsel of Record
Law Forward, Inc.
222 W. Washington Ave., Suite 250
Madison, WI 53703

mbarnes@lawforward.org
9207401816
Party name: Law Forward, et al.
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: States of Arkansas, Arizona, Alabama, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Texas, and Utah.
Christopher Jason Cariello
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

ccariello@orrick.com
2125065000
Party name: Scholars of State Constitutional Law
David William Telford Carroll
    Counsel of Record
Carroll, Ucker & Hemmer LLC
PO Box 12045
Columbus, OH 43212

dcarroll@cuhlaw.com
614-423-9820
Party name: White House Watch, a project of United States Public Policy Council et al. (including 33 Individuals)
Gregory L. Diskant
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler, LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

gldiskant@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: FairDistricts Now
Michael Nicholas Donofrio
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa St., Ste. 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

mdonofrio@stris.com
2139956800
Party name: Michael L. Rosin
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave, #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

jeastman@ccg1776.com
909-257-3869
Party name: The Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
1650 Market Street
Suite 5000
Philadelphia, PA 19103

ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-656-3300
Party name: Retired Four-Star Admirals and Generals, and Former Service Secretaries of the U.S. Armed Forces
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Gov. Arnold Schwarzenegger
Faith Elizabeth Gay
    Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
17th Floor
New York, NY 10104

fgay@selendygay.com
212-390-9000
Party name: American Bar Association
Eugene H. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Eugene H. Goldberg, Esq.
686 Harrison Avenue
East Meadow, NY 11554

eman352@optonline.net
516-485-9344
Party name: Eugene H. Goldberg
Lee Elton Goodman
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

lgoodman@wiley.law
(202) 719-7000
Party name: The American Legislative Exchange Council
Phillip Michael Gordon
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

pgordon@holtzmanvogel.com
540-341-8808
Party name: National Republican Redistricting Trust
John Matthew Gore
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

jmgore@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Restoring Integrity and Trust in Elections, Inc.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Michael Julian Gottlieb
    Counsel of Record
WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
1875 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

MGottlieb@willkie.com
2023031442
Party name: State Constitutional Historians Lawrence Friedman and Robert F. Williams
John Barney Harris
    Counsel of Record
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz P.C.
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005

jharris@fkks.com
(212) 705-4823
Party name: The Anti-Defamation League, The Sikh Coalition, The Union for Reform Judaism, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Women of Reform Judaism, and Men of Reform Judaism
Richard Hasen
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
385 Charles E. Young Drive East
Los Angeles, CA 90095

hasen@law.ucla.edu
(310) 206-3103
Party name: Richard L. Hasen
Anthony R. Holtzman
    Counsel of Record
K&L Gates LLP
17 North Second Street
Harrisburg, PA 17101

anthony.holtzman@klgates.com
717-231-4570
Party name: Senator Kim Ward, the Majority Leader of the Pennsylvania Senate, and the Republican Caucus of the Pennsylvania Senate
Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

jhurwitz@paulweiss.com
(212) 373-3254
Party name: Scholars of the Founding Era
Marcos Daniel Jimenez
    Counsel of Record
Leon Cosgrove Jimenez, LLP
255 Alhambra Circle
8th Floor
Miami, FL 33134

mjimenez@leoncosgrove.com
305-740-1975
Party name: Benjamin L. Ginsberg
Brett William Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P.
400 E. Van Buren
Phoenix, AZ 85004

bwjohnson@swlaw.com
602-382-6312
Party name: Independent Redistricting Commission
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: APA Watch
Erick G. Kaardal
    Counsel of Record
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson P.A.
150 South Fifth Street, Suite 3100
Minneapolis, MN 55402

kaardal@mklaw.com
612-465-0927
Party name: Wisconsin Voter Alliance and Pure Integrity Michigan Elections
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
Wake Forest University School of Law
PO Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
3367585832
Party name: The National Association of Counties, The National League of Cities, The U.S. Conference of Mayors, The International City/County Management Association, and The International Municipal Lawyers Association
Gary Michael Lawkowski
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group
2121 Eisenhower Avenue, Suite 402
Alexandria, VA 22314

GLawkowski@dhillonlaw.com
7039650330
Party name: Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and the Presidential Coalition
Rebecca MacDowell Lecaroz
    Counsel of Record
Brown Rudnick LLP
One Financial Center
Boston, MA 02111

rlecaroz@brownrudnick.com
(617) 856-8200
Party name: Boston University Center for Antiracist Research and Professor Atiba R. Ellis
Theresa Jeane Lee
    Counsel of Record
Election Law Clinic, Harvard Law School
6 Everett Street
Suite 4105
Cambridge, MA 02138

thlee@law.harvard.edu
8453236706
Party name: Carolyn Shapiro, Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos, Daniel P. Tokaji
Angela Marie Liu
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
35 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3400
Chicago, IL 60601

angela.liu@dechert.com
312-646-5800
Party name: Democracy and Race Scholars
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: The Making Every Vote Count Foundation and The Leadership Now Foundation
Harmony Ann Mappes
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
300 N. Meridian Street, Suite 2500
Indianapolis, IN 46204

harmony.mappes@faegredrinker.com
(317) 237-8246
Party name: Women4Change Indiana, Inc.
Jorge Martinez-Luciano
    Counsel of Record
ML & RE Law Office
Cobian's Plaza, Suite 404
1607 Ponce De Leon Ave.
San Juan, PR 00909

jorge@mlrelaw.com
7879992972
Party name: Hon. Rafael Hernandez Montañez, in his official capacity as Speaker of the Puerto Rico House of Representatives
Mary B. McCord
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

mbm7@georgetown.edu
202-661-6607
Party name: Bipartisan Group of Former Public Officials, Former Judges, and Election Experts From Pennsylvania
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: Professor Evan Bernick
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: America First Legal Foundation
Stuart Charles Naifeh
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
40 Rector St
5th Flr
New York, NY 10006

snaifeh@naacpldf.org
(917) 574-5846
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Cameron Thomas Norris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste 700
Arlington, VA 22209

cam@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Honest Elections Project
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
7205086548
Party name: Secretaries of State of Colorado, et al.
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, Inc.
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: Senator Amy Klobuchar, et al.
Jesus Armando Osete
    Counsel of Record
Secretary of State of Missouri
600 W. Main St.
Jefferson City, MO 65101

Jesus.Osete@sos.mo.gov
(573) 751-4875
Party name: Hon. John R. Ashcroft
Mark Alexander Packman
    Counsel of Record
Gilbert LLP
700 Pennsylvania Avenue, SE
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20003

packmanm@gilbertlegal.com
202-772-2320
Party name: Donetta Davidson, Tracy Howard, Neal Kelley, Roxanna Moritz, Helen Purcell, Al Schmidt, DeForest Soaries, and Janice Winfrey
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Conference of Chief Justices
Gershon Michael Ratner
    Counsel of Record
8209 Hamilton Spring Court
Bethesda, MD 20817

gratner@rcn.com
(301) 469-8000
Party name: Lawyers Defending American Democracy
David B. Rivkin Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

drivkin@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1731
Party name: Lawyers Democracy Fund and State Legislators
Ezra David Rosenberg
    Counsel of Record
Lawyer's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org
(202) 662-8600
Party name: The Lawyers’ Committee For Civil Rights Under Law, Advancement Project, Asian American Legal Defense And Education Fund, Asian Americans Advancing Justice, Demos, Latinojustice, Leadership Conference, National Association For The Advancement Of Colored People, National Education Association, National Urban League, Native American Rights Fund, New York County Lawyers’ Association, North Carolina State Conference Of The Naacp, People For The American Way & The Workers Circle.
H. David Rosenbloom
    Counsel of Record
Caplin & Drysdale
1 Thomas Cir NW # 1100
Washington, DC 20005

drosenbloom@capdale.com
2028625037
Party name: Charles Plambeck and Joni Walser
Joshua Aaron Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Public Rights Project
490 43rd Street
Unit 115
Oakland, CA 94609

josh@publicrightsproject.org
3306070730
Party name: Local Government Law Professors
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: Former Republican Elected and Executive Branch Officials
Karl J. Sandstrom
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 13th Street, NW
8th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

KSandstrom@perkinscoie.com
2026546202
Party name: Current and Former Election Administrators
Ari Joseph Savitzky
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

asavitzky@aclu.org
2125492681
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, the ACLU of North Carolina, the Rutherford Institute, and the Niskanen Center
Stephen Mark Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
5111 Westridge Road
Bethesda, MD 20816

sshapiro2018@law.gwu.edu
(301) 229-6241
Party name: Stephen M. Shapiro
Jonathan Lee Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Fair Elections Center
1825 K St . NW. Suite 450
Washington, DC 20003

jsherman@fairelectionscenter.org
8455969081
Party name: League of Women Voters of The United States and Leagues of Women Voters Representing 50 States and The District Of Columbia
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1101 14th Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: Campaign Legal Center, Democracy 21, End Citizens United//Let America Vote Action Fund, National Council of Jewish Women, Inc., OneVirginia2021, RepresentUs, Republican Women for Progress, Unitarian Universalists for Social Justice, and Voters Not Politicians
Gerson H. Smoger
    Counsel of Record
Smoger & Associates
13250 Branch View Lane
Dallas, TX 75234

gerson@texasinjurylaw.com
510-531-4529
Party name: U.S. Senator Sheldon Whitehouse and Representative Henry “Hank” Johnson, Jr.
Daniel Martin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

dsullivan@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Professor Derek T. Muller
Brian Adair Sutherland
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith, LLP
101 2nd Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

bsutherland@reedsmith.com
415 543 8700
Party name: William M. Treanor
Ellyde Roko Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

ellydethompson@quinnemanuel.com
212-849-7344
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jtorchinsky@holtzmanvogel.com
540 341 8808
Party name: Republican National Committee, NRCC, North Carolina Republican Party
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe, Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(608) 999-1240
Party name: Group of New York Voters
Caroline Sage Van Zile
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General for D.C.
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

caroline.vanzile@dc.gov
(202) 724-6609
Party name: District of Columbia, Illinois, et al.
David Stevenson Walker II
    Counsel of Record
Walker Kiger, PLLC
100 Professional Ct, Suite 102
Garner, NC 27529

steven@walkerkiger.com
984-200-1930
Party name: Taxpayers for Honest Elections
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20037

SETH.WAXMAN@WILMERHALE.COM
202-663-6800
Party name: North Carolina Senator Daniel T. Blue, Jr. and North Carolina Representative Robert T. Reives, II
Rishi Nachiketa Zutshi
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
1 Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

rzutshi@cgsh.com
212-225-2085
Party name: Human Rights Watch

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543