Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-121
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-121
Title:Christiana Tah, et al., Petitioners
v.
Global Witness Publishing, Inc., et al.
Docketed:July 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-7132, 19-7133)
   Decision Date:March 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Aug 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 27, 2021 to September 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 27, 2021.
Aug 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Beverly Hills Bar Association, Litigation Section, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2021Brief of respondents Global Witness Publishing, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Rodney A. Smolla
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
4601 Concord Pike
Wilmington,, DE 19803

rasmolla@widener.edu
(302)477-2278
Party name: Christiana Tah, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Chad Russell Bowman
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1909 K Street, NW
Twelfth Floor
Washington, DC 20006-1157

bowmanchad@ballardspahr.com
(202) 508-1120
Party name: Global Witness Publishing, Inc.,, et al.
Other
D. Alexander Floum
    Counsel of Record
Hillary Johns, Trial Lawyer
9595 Wilshire Boulevard, 9th Floor
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

alex@hillarytriallawyer.com
9258181702
Party name: Beverly Hills Bar Association, Litigation Section

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543