Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1173 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1173 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Joe Elton Nixon, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:February 24, 2022
Linked with 21A229
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(20-48)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:October 27, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2021Application (21A229) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2022 to March 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Dec 15 2021Application (21A229) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 24, 2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joe Elton Nixon
Blanket Consent
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2022 to April 27, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 27, 2022.
Mar 28 2022Brief amici curiae of The National Disability Rights Network and Disability Rights Florida filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 27, 2022 to May 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 11, 2022.
May 11 2022Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 26 2022Reply of petitioner Joe Elton Nixon filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric M. Freedman
    Counsel of Record
Hofstra University School of Law
250 West 94th Street
New York, NY 10025

Eric.M.Freedman@Hofstra.edu
212-665-2713
Party name: Joe Elton Nixon
Attorneys for Respondent
Henry Charles Whitaker
    Counsel of Record
Florida Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

henry.whitaker@myfloridalegal.com
8504143688
Party name: Florida
Other
John H. Blume
    Counsel of Record
Cornell Law School
159 Hughes Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853

jb94@cornell.edu
6072551030
Party name: The National Disability Rights Network and Disability Rights Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543