Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1172
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1172
Title:American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
Docketed:February 24, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-55734)
   Decision Date:October 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:November 23, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 10 2022Waiver of right of respondent Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Mar 23 2022Response Requested. (Due April 22, 2022)
Mar 28 2022Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2022 to May 23, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2022.
Apr 12 2022Brief amici curiae of Fight for Freelancers, et al filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2022Brief amici curiae of Independent Institute, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2022Brief of respondent Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2022Reply of petitioners American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., et al. filed.(Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James M. Manley
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

JManley@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Passchier Siegel
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Avenue
Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

sam.siegel@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3917
Party name: Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
Jose A. Zelidon-ZepedaAttorney General's Office
455 Golden Gate Ave.
Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Jose.ZelidonZepeda@doj.ca.gov
4155103879
Party name: Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California
Other
Maurice Baskin
    Counsel of Record
Littler Mendelson, PC
815 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mbaskin@littler.com
202-842-3400
Party name: Fight for Freelancers, et al
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue N.W.
Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

agura@ifs.org
202.301.3300
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Krystal Brunner Swendsboe
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

Kswendsboe@wiley.law
202-719-7000
Party name: Independent Institute, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Americans for Prosperity Foundation, and New Jobs America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543