Nov 30 2021 | Application (21A197) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2021 to January 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Dec 02 2021 | Application (21A197) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 26, 2022. |
| |
Jan 26 2022 | Motion (21M78) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed. |
| |
Jan 26 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2022) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 02 2022 | MOTION (21M78) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022. |
| |
Feb 22 2022 | Motion (21M78) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted. |
| |
Mar 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 24, 2022 to April 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 02 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 11, 2022. |
| |
Mar 24 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Legal Ethics Scholars and Law Professors filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 24 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Due Process Institute, et al. filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Apr 11 2022 | Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Apr 25 2022 | Reply of petitioner Dennis Spencer filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Apr 26 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022. |
| |
May 16 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
| |