Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-1065
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-1065
Title:Dennis Wayne Hope, Petitioner
v.
Todd Harris, et al.
Docketed:February 1, 2022
Linked with 21A171
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-40379)
   Decision Date:June 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 19 2021Application (21A171) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 30, 2021 to January 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 29 2021Application (21A171) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 28, 2022.
Jan 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 3, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 09 2022Waiver of right of respondent Todd Harris, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor John F. Stinneford filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Prosecutors and Department of Justice Officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Feb 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors and Practitioners of Psychiatry, Psychology, and Medicine filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 21 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Corrections Directors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 23 2022Response Requested. (Due March 25, 2022)
Mar 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2022 to May 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 9, 2022.
May 09 2022Brief of respondents Todd Harris, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
May 24 2022Reply of petitioner Dennis Wayne Hope filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2022Letter from counsel for respondents filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2022Joint motion to hold petition for a writ of certiorari in abeyance filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 09 2022Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Easha Anand
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
2443 Fillmore Street #380-15875
San Francisco, CA 94115

easha.anand@macarthurjustice.org
510-588-1274
Party name: Dennis Wayne Hope
Attorneys for Respondents
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Todd Harris, et al.
Other
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Professors and Practitioners of Psychiatry, Psychology, and Medicine
Mary B. McCord
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy and Protecti
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

mbm7@georgetown.edu
202-661-6607
Party name: Current and Former Prosecutors and Department of Justice Officials
Laura L. Rovner
    Counsel of Record
Student Law Office | Civil Rights Clinic
University of Denver Sturm College of Law
2255 East Evans Avenue, Suite 335
Denver, CO 80208

lrovner@law.du.edu
(303) 871-6441
Party name: Former Corrections Directors
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: John F. Stinneford

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543