Docket for 21-1044 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 21 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 11 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2022 to April 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 14 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 11, 2022. | | | Apr 11 2022 | Brief of respondent James Nathaniel Bryant, III in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 11 2022 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent James Nathaniel Bryant, III. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 26 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022. | | | Apr 26 2022 | Reply of petitioners Bryan P. Stirling, Director, South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 16 2022 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. | | | May 16 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|