Docket for 21-1021 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 18 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2022) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 31 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 22, 2022 to March 24, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 24, 2022. | | | Mar 21 2022 | Brief of respondent Alvin B. Jackson in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 21 2022 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Alvin B. Jackson. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 06 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022. | | | Apr 06 2022 | Reply of petitioner Dexter Payne, Director, Arkansas Division of Correction filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 22 2022 | Rescheduled. | | | Apr 25 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022. | | | Apr 29 2022 | Rescheduled. | | | May 09 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022. | | | May 11 2022 | Rescheduled. | | | May 16 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022. | | | May 23 2022 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. | | | May 23 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|