Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A94
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A94
Title:Harvest Rock Church, Inc., et al., Applicants
v.
Gavin Newsom, Governor of California
Docketed:November 24, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-55907)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2020Application (20A94) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceOther
Nov 25 2020Response to application (20A94) requested by Justice Kagan, due Monday, November 30, by 5 p.m. (docket entry updated 11/26/20)
Nov 25 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 27 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Epidemiologists and Public Health Experts.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 30 2020Response to application from respondent Gavin Newsom, Governor of California filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 01 2020Reply of applicants Harvest Rock Church, Inc., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Dec 01 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by South Bay United Pemtecostal Church, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 03 2020Application (20A94) referred to the Court.
Dec 03 2020The application for injunctive relief, presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court, is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment, and the petition is granted. The September 2 order of the United States District Court for the Central District of California is vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit with instructions to remand to the District Court for further consideration in light of Roman Catholic Diocese of Brooklyn v. Cuomo, 592 U. S. ___ (2020).
Dec 09 2020Renewed application of Harvest Rock Church, Inc., et al. not accepted for filing (December 14, 2020).
Jan 04 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Harvest Rock Church, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Seth Eden Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
California Attorney General's Office
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 94244

Seth.Goldstein@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6063
Party name: Governor Gavin Newsom
Other
Alexander J. Luchenitser
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L St. NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

luchenitser@au.org
202-466-7306
Party name: Americans United for Separation of Church and State; Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice; Covenant Network of Presbyterians; Disciples Center for Public Witness; Disciples Justice Action Network; Equal Partners in Faith; Interfaith Alliance Foundation; Methodist Federation for Social Action; Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association
Susannah Landes Foster Weaver
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg, Weaver & Littleton
1008 Pennsylvania Ave. SE
Washington, DC 20003

susannah@donahuegoldberg.com
2025693818
Party name: Epidemiologists and Public Health Experts

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543