Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A84
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A84
Title:Republican Party of Pennsylvania, Applicant
v.
Kathy Boockvar, Secretary of Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:
Linked with 20-542
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(133 MM 2020)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2020Application (20A84) for injunctive relief pending the disposition of the petition for certiorari, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 06 2020Order issued by Justice Alito: All county boards of election are hereby ordered, pending further order of the Court, to comply with the following guidance provided by the Secretary of the Commonwealth on October 28 and November 1, namely, (1) that all ballots received by mail after 8:00 p.m. on November 3 be segregated and kept “in a secure, safe and sealed container separate from other voted ballots,” and (2) that all such ballots, if counted, be counted separately. Pa. Dep’t of State, Pennsylvania Guidance for Mail-in and Absentee Ballots Received From the United States Postal Service After 8:00 p.m. on Tuesday, November 3, 2020 (Oct. 28, 2020); Pa. Dep’t of State, Canvassing Segregated Mail-in and Civilian Absentee Ballots Received by Mail After 8:00 p.m. on Tuesday, November 3, 2020 and Before 5:00 p.m. on Friday, November 6, 2020 (Nov. 1, 2020). Until today, this Court was not informed that the guidance issued on October 28, which had an important bearing on the question whether to order special treatment of the ballots in question, had been modified. The application received today also informs the Court that neither the applicant nor the Secretary has been able to verify that all boards are complying with the Secretary’s guidance, which, it is alleged, is not legally binding on them. I am immediately referring this application to the Conference and direct that any response be filed as soon as possible but in any event no later than 2 p.m. tomorrow, November 7, 2020.
Nov 06 2020Response to application from respondent Pennsylvania Democratic Party filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 07 2020Response to application from respondent Kathy Boockvar, Secretary of Pennsylvania filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Nov 07 2020Response to application from respondent Luzerne County Board of Elections filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 08 2020Letter of respondent Kathy Boockvar, Secretary of Pennsylvania filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Reply of applicant Republican Party of Pennsylvania filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Nov 13 2020Motion to File Amicus Brief of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund submitted.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Matthew Gore
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

jmgore@jonesday.com
2028793939
Party name: Republican Party of Pennsylvania
Attorneys for Respondents
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Pennsylvania Democratic Party
Joseph Matthias Cosgrove
    Counsel of Record
Selingo Guagliardo LLC
345 Market Street
Kingston, PA 18704

jmcosgro@msn.com
570-287-2400
Party name: Luzerne County Board of Elections
John Bartley DeLone
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General -Appellate Litigation Section
15th Floor, Strawberry Square
Harrisburg, PA 17120

jdelone@attorneygeneral.gov
717-783-3226
Party name: Kathy Boockvar, Secretary of Pennsylvania
Other
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543