Docket for 20A163
|
May 03 2021 | Application (20A163) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 04 2021 | Response to application (20A163) requested by Justice Gorsuch, due Friday, May 14, by 3 p.m. ET. | | | May 14 2021 | Response to application from respondents Jared Polis, Governor of Colorado, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service | May 19 2021 | Reply of applicants Denver Bible Church, et al. filed. | | ReplyProof of Service | Jun 01 2021 | Application (20A163) denied by Justice Gorsuch. | | |
|