Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A15
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A15
Title:Committees of the United States House of Representatives, Applicants
v.
Donald J. Trump, et al.
Docketed:July 13, 2020
Linked with 19-715
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5142)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 13 2020Application (20A15) of Committees of U.S. House of Representatives for an order to issue the judgment forthwith, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 14 2020Response to application (20A15) requested by The Chief Justice, due Thursday, July 16, by 4 p.m.
Jul 16 2020Response to application from respondent Donald J. Trump, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Application (20A15) referred to the Court.
Jul 20 2020Application (20A15) denied by the Court. Justice Sotomayor would grant the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
2022259700
Party name: Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives
Attorneys for Respondents
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Donald J. Trump, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543