SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-975 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-975 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Freddie Owens, Petitioner
v.
Bryan P. Stirling, Director, South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:
January 22, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-8)
Decision Date:
July 22, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
August 18, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 22 2021
Brief of respondents Bryan P. Stirling, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 23 2021
Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from March 10, 2021 to March 31, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 24 2021
Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until March 31, 2021 granted.
Mar 26 2021
Reply of petitioner Freddie Owens filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Francis Williams
Counsel of Record
Kirkland and Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004
michael.williams@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Freddie Owens
Attorneys for Respondents
Melody Jane Brown
Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
Post Office Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211
mbrown@scag.gov
803-734-3970
Party name: Bryan P. Stirling, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##