Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-922 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-922 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Lisa Marie Montgomery, Petitioner
v.
Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2021
Linked with 20A121
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5379)
   Decision Date:January 1, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:January 5, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2021Application (20A121) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2021Brief of respondents Jeffrey A. Rosen, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 12 2021Reply of petitioner Lisa Marie Montgomery filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2021Application (20A121) referred to the Court.
Jan 12 2021Petition DENIED.
Jan 12 2021Application (20A121) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: Lisa Marie Montgomery
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jeffrey Rosen, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543