Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-891
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-891
Title:American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Neapco Holdings LLC, et al.
Docketed:January 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1763)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 4, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jan 11 2021Waiver of right of respondent Neapco Holdings LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Jan 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2021Response Requested. (Due March 1, 2021)
Jan 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Alliance of U.S. Startups & Inventors for Jobs filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2021Brief amici curiae of The Chicago Patent Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2021 to March 31, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of New York City Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 31, 2021.
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors Jeffrey A. Lefstin and Peter S. Menell filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Ameranth, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of Biotechnology Innovation Organization and AUTM filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amici curiae of United States Senator Thom Tillis, Honorable Paul R. Michel and Honorable David J. Kappos filed.(Corercted version submitted 3/12/2021)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of Houston Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief of respondents Neapco Holdings LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Richard Nuttall
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
227 West Monroe, Suite 4700
Chicago, IL 60606

jnuttall@steptoe.com
312-577-1260
Party name: American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
J. Michael Huget
    Counsel of Record
Honigman LLP
315 East Eisenhower Parkway
Suite 100
Ann Arbor, MI 48108

mhuget@honigman.com
734-418-4254
Party name: Neapco Holdings LLC, et al.
Other
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
    Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
3440 Toringdon Way, Suite 310
Charlotte, NC 28277

jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
Lester Lee Eubanks IV
    Counsel of Record
Eubanks PLLC
12777 Jones Rd.
Suite 465
Houston, TX 77070

leubanks@eubanksip.com
2819754005
Party name: Houston Intellectual Property Law Association
Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried
    Counsel of Record
Ganzfried Law
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW Suite 440
Washington, DC 20015

JJG@ganzfriedlaw.com
202-486-2004
Party name: Ameranth, Inc.
Peter S. Menell
    Counsel of Record
University of California
Univ. of California, Berkeley School of Law
225 Bancroft Way
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

pmenell@law.berkeley.edu
5106425489
Party name: Professors Jeffrey A. Lefstin and Peter S. Menell
Robert Joseph Rando
    Counsel of Record
Association of Amicus Counsel
490 Merrick Road
Suite 350
Massapequa Park, NY 11762

rrando@amicuscounsel.org
5167999800
Party name: United States Senator Thom Tillis, Honorable Paul R. Michel and Honorable David J. Kappos
Jason Edward Weil
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
2001 Market Street, Suite 4100, Two Commerce Square
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jweil@akingump.com
215-965-1328
Party name: Biotechnology Innovation Organization and AUTM
Jason Edward Weil
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
2001 Market Street, Suite 4100, Two Commerce Square
Philadelphia, PA 19103

jweil@akingump.com
215-965-1328
Party name: Biotechnology Innovation and AUTM
Charles Robert Macedo
    Counsel of Record
Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

cmacedo@arelaw.com
212-336-8000
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Kevin Edward Noonan
    Counsel of Record
McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff LLP
300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3100
Chicago, IL 60606

noonan@mbhb.com
312-913-0001
Party name: The Chicago Patent Attorneys
Aaron Ligoury Joseph Pereira
    Counsel of Record
Panitch Schwarze Belisario & Nadel LLP
2001 Market Street
Suite #2800
Philadelphia, NJ 19103

apereira@panitchlaw.com
2159651348
Party name: New York City Bar Association
Robert P. Taylor
    Counsel of Record
RPT Legal Strategies PC
2443 Fillmore Street
Suite 332
San Francisco, CA 94115

robert.taylor@rptstrategies.com
(415) 447-3975
Party name: Alliance of U.S. Startups & Inventors for Jobs

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543