Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-843
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-843
Title:New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Kevin P. Bruen, in His Official Capacity as Superintendent of New York State Police, et al.
Docketed:December 23, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-156)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2021 to February 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2021.
Jan 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition and Firearms Policy Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Korte Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Korte Tree Care filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2021Brief amici curiae of State of Missouri.et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Law Enforcement Groups and State and Local Firearms Rights Groups filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Neal Goldfarb filed. (Brief corrected 3/1/21)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 22 2021Brief of respondents Keith M. Corlett, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 10 2021Reply of petitioners New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Apr 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 26 2021Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether the State's denial of petitioners' applications for concealed-carry licenses for self-defense violated the Second Amendment.
May 07 2021Motion for an extension of time file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 2, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 23, 2021.
May 27 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 16 2021Motion for an further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 25 2021Motion to further extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is further extended to and including July 13, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is further extended to and including September 14, 2021.
Jul 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of Alabama Center for Law and Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2021Brief of petitioners New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2021Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Jul 13 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2021Brief amici curiae of Bay Colony Weapons Collectors, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Association of New Jersey Rifle & Pistol Clubs, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Italo-American Jurists and Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of National African American Gun Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation's Center to Keep and Bear Arms filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of George K. Young Jr. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief amici curiae of Representative Claudia Tenney and 175 Additional Members of the U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief amici curiae of The DC Project Foundation; Operation Blazing Sword—Pink Pistols; Jews for the Preservation of Firearms Ownership filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Patrick J. Charles in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of J. Joel Alicea filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Constitutional Rights Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Shooting Sports Foundation Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Independent Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of State of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Governor of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Law Enforcement Groups and State and Local Firearms Rights Groups filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of The Liberal Gun Club and Commonwealth Second Amendment filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated and Second Amendment Law Center, Inc filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, and Heller Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of William English, Ph.D. and The Center for Human Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Second Amendment Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Lambert Henry, Russell Davenport, and Peter Fusco filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Center for Defense of Free Enterprise, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of The League for Sportsmen, Law Enforcement and Defense filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of United States Senator Ted Cruz, and 24 Other U.S. Senators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of National Foundation for Gun Rights and National Association for Gun Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Black Guns Matter, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors Robert Leider and Nelson Lund, and the Buckeye Firearms Association filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Asian Pacific American Gun Owners Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of FPC American Victory Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Madison Society Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of The Firearms Policy Coalition and Professor Joyce Lee Malcolm filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of NRA Civil Rights Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of California Gun Rights Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Second Amendment Law Professors in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Crime Prevention Research Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jul 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Black Attorneys of Legal Aid, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Kevin P. Bruen, et al.
Other
H. Christopher Bartolomucci
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

cbartolomucci@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: United States Senator Ted Cruz, and 24 Other U.S. Senators
Alan Alexander Beck
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Alan Beck
2692 Harcourt Drive
San Diego, CA 92123

alan.alexander.beck@gmail.com
6199059105
Party name: George K. Young
Bradley Alan Benbrook
    Counsel of Record
Benbrook Law Group
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530
Sacramento, CA 95814

brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
9164474900
Party name: Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms
Christopher Michael Day
    Counsel of Record
Juris Day, PLLC
10521 Judicial Drive
Suite 200
Fairfax, VA 22030

cmday@jurisday.com
7032685600
Party name: The League for Sportsmen, Law Enforcement, and Defense
Derek Andrew DeBrosse
    Counsel of Record
Cheshire DeBrosse, P.C.
503 South Front Street
Suite 240B
Columbus, OH 43215

derek@munitionsgroup.com
888-399-7863
Party name: Professors Robert Leider and Nelson Lund, and the Buckeye Firearms Association
Steven W. Dulan
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Steven W. Dulan, PLC
5311 Park Lake Road
East Lansing, MI 48823

swdulan@stevenwdulan.com
517-332-3147
Party name: Crime Prevention Research Center
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave, #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

jeastman@ccg1776.com
909-257-3869
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

drew.ensign@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: State of Arizona, et al.
Charles Randall Flores
    Counsel of Record
Beck Redden LLP
1221 McKinney St.
Suite 4500
Houston, TX 77010

cflores@beckredden.com
713-951-6268
Party name: The DC Project Foundation; Operation Blazing Sword—Pink Pistols; Jews for the Preservation of Firearms Ownership
Sarah Anne Gervase
    Counsel of Record
Office of the General Counsel, National Rifle Asso
11250 Waples Mill Road
Fairfax, VA 22030-9400

sgervase@nrahq.org
7032671256
Party name: Italo-American Jurists and Attorneys
Jonathan Shae Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein Law Partners, LLC
11 Church Road
Hatfield, PA 19440

jgoldstein@goldsteinlp.com
610.949.0444
Party name: Black Guns Matter, et al.
Jonathan Shae Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein Law Partners, LLC
11 Church Road
Hatfield, PA 19440

jgoldstein@goldsteinlp.com
610.949.0444
Party name: Armed Equality
Jonathan Shae Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein Law Partners, LLC
11 Church Road
Hatfield, PA 19440

jgoldstein@goldsteinlp.com
610.949.0444
Party name: A Girl & A Gun Women's Shooting League
John Michael Grenfell
    Counsel of Record
Four Embarcadero Center, 22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

john.grenfell@pillsburylaw.com
415-983-1000
Party name: Patrick J. Charles
Stephen Porter Halbrook
    Counsel of Record
Stephen P. Halbrook, PH.D.Attorney at Law
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

protell@aol.com
703-352-7276
Party name: National African American Gun Association, Inc.
David T. Hardy
    Counsel of Record
8987 E. Tanque Verde
No. 265
Tucson, AZ 85749

dthardy@mindspring.com
(520) 749-0241
Party name: FPC American Victory Fund, Coalition of New Jersey Firearms Owners, San Diego County Gun Owners, Orange County Gun Owners, Riverside County Gun Owners, California County Gun Owners, and Knife Rights Foundation, Inc.
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: California Gun Rights Foundation
David D. Jensen
    Counsel of Record
David Jensen PLLC
33 Henry Street
Beacon, NY 12508

david@djensenpllc.com
212-380-6615
Party name: Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc.
David D. Jensen
    Counsel of Record
David Jensen PLLC
44 Henry Street
Beacon, NY 12508

david@djensenpllc.com
212-380-6615
Party name: The Liberal Gun Club and Commonwealth Second Amendment
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
200 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

scott@lehotskykeller.com
512-693-8350
Party name: The Firearms Policy Coalition and Professor Joyce Lee Malcolm
Adam Jeremy Kraut
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Coalition
1215 K Street, 17th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

akraut@fpclaw.org
(916) 378-5785
Party name: Madison Society Foundation, Inc.
Steven M. Lester
    Counsel of Record
La Reddola, Lester & Associates, LLP
600 Old Country Road, Suite 230
Garden City, NY 11530

sml@llalawfirm.com
5167451951
Party name: Lambert Henry, Russell Davenport, and Peter Fusco
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: Asian Pacific American Gun Owners Association
Michael J. Lockerby
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
Washington Harbour
3000 K Street, N.W., Suite 600
Washington, DC 20007

mlockerby@foley.com
202-945-6079
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

taylor@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: NRA Civil Rights Defense Fund
C. D. Michel
    Counsel of Record
Michel & Associates, P.C.
180 E. Ocean Blvd. Ste. 200
Long Beach, CA 90802

cmichel@michellawyers.com
(562) 216-4444
Party name: California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated and Second Amendment Law Center, Inc
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: National Shooting Sports Foundation Inc.
Jerad Wayne Najvar
    Counsel of Record
Najvar Law Firm, PLLC
2180 North Loop West
Suite 255
Houston, TX 77018

jerad@najvarlaw.com
(281) 404-4696
Party name: Center for Defense of Free Enterprise, et al.
Larry James Obhof Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Shumaker, Loop and Kendrick LLP
2400 Huntington Center
41 South High Street
Columbus, OH 43215

lobhof@shumaker.com
(614) 628-4433
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
John David Ohlendorf
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

johlendorf@cooperkirk.com
(202) 220-9600
Party name: J. Joel Alicea
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W.
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, and Heller Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jackparklaw@gmail.com
470-892-6444
Party name: American Constitutional Rights Union
John Michael Reeves Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Reeves Law LLC
7733 Forsyth Blvd.
Suite 1100 - #1192
St. Louis, MO 63105

reeves@reeveslawstl.com
3147756985
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center
Avinash Nitin Samarth
    Counsel of Record
Neighborhood Defender Service of Harlem
317 Malcolm X Boulevard
10th Floor
New York, NY 10027

asamarth@ndsny.org
(347) 443-2072
Party name: Black Attorneys of Legal Aid, The Bronx Defenders, Brooklyn Defender Services, et al.
Brian David Schmalzbach
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

bschmalzbach@mcguirewoods.com
8047754746
Party name: Representative Claudia Tenney and 175 Additional Members of the U.S. House of Representatives
Daniel L. Schmutter
    Counsel of Record
Hartman & Winnicki, P.C.
74 Passaic Street
Ridgewood, NJ 07450

dschmutter@hartmanwinnicki.com
201-967-8040
Party name: Association of New Jersey Rifle & Pistol Clubs, Inc.
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law & Justice
201 Maryland Ave., N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
James Patrick Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Governor of Texas
1100 San Jacinto Boulevard, Fourth Floor
Austin, TX 78711

james.sullivan@gov.texas.gov
512-936-7236
Party name: Governor of Texas
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Second Amendment Foundation, et al.
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Second Amendment Law Professors
David Alan Warrington
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group Inc.
177 Post Street, Suite 700
San Francisco, CA 94108

david.warrington@kutakrock.com
(415) 433-1700
Party name: National Foundation for Gun Rights and National Association for Gun Rights
Camden Robert Webb
    Counsel of Record
Williams Mullen
301 Fayetteville Street
Suite 1700
Raleigh, NC 27601

crwebb@williamsmullen.com
919-981-4000
Party name: The Goldwater Institute
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel PLLC
2300 N Street, NW
Suite 643A
Washington, DC 20037

emwenger@HoltzmanVogel.com
850-425-2352
Party name: The Independent Institute
Philip Daniel Williamson
    Counsel of Record
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800
Cincinnati, OH 45202

pwilliamson@taftlaw.com
5133579417
Party name: William English, Ph.D. and The Center for Human Liberty
Cody James Wisniewski
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

cody@mslegal.org
303-292-2021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation's Center to Keep and Bear Arms
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-510-1828
Party name: Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
Robert Dowlut
    Counsel of Record
9200 Bulls Run Parkway
Bethesda, MD 20817

dowlut@aol.com
3014935832
Party name: Bay Colony Weapons Collectors, Inc.
Neal Goldfarb
    Counsel of Record
1301 Fairmont St., NW
Washington, DC 20009

goldfarbneal@gmail.com
2022627886
Party name: Neal Goldfarb
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Foundation
5550 Painted Mirage Rd.
Ste. 320
Las Vegas, NV 89149

josephgreenlee@gmail.com
(970) 485-3303
Party name: Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al.
Earl Neville Mayfield IIIJuris Day, PLLC
10521 Judicial Drive, Suite 200
Fairfax, VA 22030

tmayfield@jurisday.com
7032685600
Party name: THE LEAGUE FOR SPORTSMEN, LAW ENFORCEMENT AND DEFENSE
Dan Mark Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Dan M. Peterson, PLLC
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

dan@danpetersonlaw.com
7034253741
Party name: Law Enforcement Groups and State and Local Firearms Rights Groups
John Michael Reeves Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Reeves Law LLC
3703 Watson Rd.
St. Louis, MO 63109

reeves@reeveslawstl.com
3147756985
Party name: Korte Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a Korte Tree Care
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: State of Missouri

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543