Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-809
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-809
Title:Kelli Ward, Petitioner
v.
Constance Jackson, et al.
Docketed:December 15, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CV-20-0343-AP/EL)
   Decision Date:December 8, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Douglas Wilenchik
    Counsel of Record
Wilenchik & Bartness, P.C.
2810 N. Third Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jackw@wb-law.com
602-606-2810
Party name: Kelli Ward

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543