Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-799
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-799
Title:L. Lin Wood, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Brad Raffensperger, Georgia Secretary of State, et al.
Docketed:December 11, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-14418)
   Decision Date:December 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 11, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Dec 14 2020Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (December 22, 2020) (Corrected version submitted electronically)
Dec 14 2020Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (December 29, 2020)
Dec 14 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner L. Lin Wood, Jr. submitted.
Main Document
Dec 30 2020Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (January 26, 2021)
Jan 11 2021Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED.
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Jan 27 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (February 17, 2021)
Feb 17 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (February 18, 2021)
Feb 18 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (March 10, 2021)
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.
Mar 15 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (March 25, 2021)
Mar 26 2021Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Harry W. MacDougald
    Counsel of Record
Caldwell, Propst & DeLoach, LLP
Two Ravinia Dr.
Suite 1600
Atlanta, GA 30328

hmacdougald@cpdlawyers.com
404-843-1956
Party name: L. Lin Wood, Jr.
Other
Todd Charles Bank
    Counsel of Record
Todd C. Bank, Attorney at Law, P.C.
119-40 Union Turnpike
Fourth Floor
Kew Gardens, NY 11415

tbank@toddbanklaw.com
(718) 520-7125
Party name: Todd C. Bank

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543