SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-6887 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-6887 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Harry Franklin Phillips, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
January 14, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC18-1149)
Decision Date:
May 21, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
August 14, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 16, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jan 26 2021
Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Harry Franklin Phillips
Blanket Consent
Feb 04 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2021 to April 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 19, 2021.
Feb 16 2021
Brief amici curiae of The Arc of the United States, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 19 2021
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Other
Apr 27 2021
Reply of petitioner Harry Franklin Phillips filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 05 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 24 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marie-Louise Samuels Parmer
Counsel of Record
110 S.E. 6th St.
Suite 701
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
marie@parmerdeliberato.com
813-732-3321
Party name: Harry Franklin Phillips
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050
amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3688
Party name: Florida
Other
John H. Blume
Counsel of Record
Cornell Law School
158 Myron Taylor Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853
jb94@cornell.edu
(803) 240-6701
Party name: The Arc of the United States, The National Disability Rights Network, Disability Rights Florida, The Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, and The Center for Public Representation
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##