SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-6879 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-6879 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
John D. Freeman, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
January 14, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC19-1532)
Decision Date:
August 13, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 16, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 04 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2021 to April 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 19, 2021.
Apr 19 2021
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Other
Apr 29 2021
Reply of petitioner John Freeman filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 05 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 24 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dawn Brandi Macready
Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel - North
1004 DeSoto Park Drive
Tallahassee, FL 32301
dawn.macready@ccrc-north.org
850-487-0922
Party name: John Freeman
Stacy Rowell Biggart
Office of the Capital Collateral Regional Counsel-North
1004 DeSoto Park Drive
Tallahassee, FL 32301
stacy.biggart@ccrc-north.org
8504592226
Party name: John Freeman
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050
amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3688
Party name: Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##