SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-6824 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-6824 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Raymond Bright, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
January 11, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC17-2244)
Decision Date:
April 2, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
August 13, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 10, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Feb 10 2021
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Feb 23 2021
Reply of petitioner Raymond Bright filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 25 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alicia Victoria Wiggins
Counsel of Record
Public Defender ' s Office For the Second Judicial Circuit of Florida
301 South Monroe Street, Suite 401
Tallahassee, FL 32301
victoria.wiggins@flpd2.com
8506068543
Party name: Raymond Bright
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050
amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3688
Party name: Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##