Docket for 20-643
|
Nov 06 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2020) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 11 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Nov 17 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020. | | | Dec 07 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|