Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-637
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-637
Title:Darrell Hemphill, Petitioner
v.
New York
Docketed:November 10, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(66 SSM 5)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Nov 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent State of New York to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 18 2020Response Requested. (Due December 18, 2020)
Nov 18 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner Darrell Hemphill
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2020 to February 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 1, 2021.
Dec 18 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Evidence and Criminal Procedure Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 1, 2021 to March 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentMain Document
Jan 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 1, 2021.
Mar 01 2021Brief of respondent State of New York in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 16 2021Reply of petitioner Darrell Hemphill filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021Petition GRANTED.
Apr 23 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 22, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 10, 2021.
May 14 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Darrell Hemphill
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jun 22 2021Brief of petitioner Darrell Hemphill filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 22 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Brief amici curiae of The Bronx Defenders, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers of New Jersey filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Brief amici curiae of Evidence and Criminal Procedure Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Brief amici curiae of The Innocence Project and Innocent Network filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2021Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Richard D. Friedman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, October 12, 2021.
Jul 28 2021Record has been requested from the Court of Appeals of New York.
Aug 03 2021CIRCULATED
Aug 04 2021The Court of Appeals of New York record can be accessed on its website. SEALED record material from the court of appeals electronically received. The Supreme Court of New York, County of Bronx record material has been electronically received.
Aug 10 2021Brief of respondent State of New York filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Adam Oustatcher. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2021Brief amici curiae of The District Attorneys Association of the State of New York and The National District Attorneys Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 17 2021Brief amici curiae of Brief of Utah, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Hawaii, Kansas, Louisiana, Minnesota, Mississippi, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, and South Dakota filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Reply of petitioner Darrell Hemphill filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2021ARGUMENT RESCHEDULED FOR Tuesday, October 5, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Darrell Hemphill
Attorneys for Respondent
Gina Mignola
    Counsel of Record
Bronx County District Attorney's Office
198 East 161st Street
Bronx, NY 10451

mignolag@bronxda.nyc.gov
718-838-7199
Party name: State of New York
Gina Mignola
    Counsel of Record
Bronx County District Attorney's Office
198 East 161st Street
Bronx, NY 10451

mignolag@bronxda.nyc.gov
718-838-7199
Party name: New York
Noah Jeffrey ChamoyOffice of the Bronx District Attorney
198 East 161 Street
Bronx, NY 10451

chamoyn@bronxda.nyc.gov
7188387142
Party name: State of New York
Other
David M. Cohn
    Counsel of Record
New York County District Attorney's Office
One Hogan Place
New York, NY 10013

cohnd@dany.nyc.gov
212-335-4098
Party name: The District Attorneys Association of the State of New York and The National District Apporneys Association
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: The Bronx Defenders, et al.
James Connolly Dugan
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

jdugan@willkie.com
212-728-8654
Party name: The Innocence Project and Innocent Network
Richard D. Friedman
    Counsel of Record
625 South State Street
Ann Arbor, MI 48109

rdfrdman@umich.edu
734 647 1078
Party name: Richard D. Friedman
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Caitlin Joan Halligan
    Counsel of Record
Selendy & Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

challigan@selendygay.com
(212) 390-9000
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union, The New York Civil Liberties Union and The Rutherford Institute
Melissa Ann Holyoak
    Counsel of Record
Utah Attorney General's Office
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114

melissaholyoak@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: Brief of Utah, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Hawaii, Kansas, Louisiana, Minnesota, Mississippi, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, and South Dakota
Nicholas David Marais
    Counsel of Record
Keker, Van Nest & Peters, LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

nmarais@keker.com
415-391-5400
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Adam Seth Oustatcher
    Counsel of Record
55 Broadway
Suite 202
New York, NY 10006

aoustatcher@gmail.com
(917) 881-9307
Party name: Adam Oustatcher
Gary S. Stein
    Counsel of Record
Pashman Stein
21 Main Street
Hackensak, NJ 07601-7054

gstein@pashmanstein.com
2013103691
Party name: Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers of New Jersey
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Evidence and Criminal Procedure Professors

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543