Docket for 20-6043 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 17 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 16, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Nov 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2020 to December 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 16 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2020. | | | Dec 14 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2020 to December 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 15 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 30, 2020. | | | Dec 30 2020 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 14 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021. | | | Feb 16 2021 | Reply of petitioner Robin Archer filed. (Received on March 2, 2021). | | Main Document | Feb 22 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|