Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-599
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-599
Title:Hirsh Singh, Petitioner
v.
Phil Murphy, Governor of New Jersey
Docketed:November 4, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of New Jersey
   Case Numbers:(C-309 September Term 2020)
   Decision Date:October 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountAppendixProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Motion expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner Singh Hirsh.
Main Document
Nov 09 2020Waiver of right of respondents Philip D. Murphy, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 07 2020Response Requested. (Due January 6, 2021)
Dec 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2021 to February 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including January 26, 2021.
Jan 26 2021Brief of respondents Philip D. Murphy, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Feb 01 2021Reply of petitioner Singh Hirsh filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Hirsh SinghPOB 407
Linwood, NJ 08221

(609) 335-5289
Party name: Singh Hirsh
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeremy Michael Feigenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ 08611

jeremy.feigenbaum@njoag.gov
2017233388
Party name: Phil Murphy, Governor of New Jersey
Susan Marie Scott
    Counsel of Record
New Jersey Department of Law and Public SafetyDi
R.J. Hughes Justice Complex
25 Market Street, P.O. Box 112
Trenton, NJ 08725-0112

susan.scott@law.njoag.gov
609-376-2955
Party name: Philip D. Murphy, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543