Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-574
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-574
Vide 20-542
Title:Joseph B. Scarnati, III, et al., Petitioners
v.
Pennsylvania Democratic Party, et al.
Docketed:October 30, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(133 MM 2020)
   Decision Date:September 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2020Motion for leave to intervene as a petitioner filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 04 2020Response to motion for leave to intervene requested, due Thursday, November 5, 2020, by 5 p.m.
Nov 04 2020Waiver of right of respondent Union County Board of Elections to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 05 2020Letter of November 5, 2020 from counsel for petitioners filed.
Main Document
Nov 05 2020Response to motion to intervene from respondents Secretary of State Kathy Boockvar, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 05 2020Response to motion from respondents Pennsylvania Democratic Party, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 05 2020Response to motion from respondent Luzerne County Board of Elections filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 05 2020Response to motion from petitioner Republican Party of Pennsylvania filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Waiver of right of respondents Carbon County Board of Elections, Monroe County Board of Elections, Pike County Board of Elections, Wayne County Board of Elections, Schuylkill County Board of Elections to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 09 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Oklahoma, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of State of Ohio filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Missouri, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2020Waiver of right of respondents Clarion County Board of Elections/Tioga County Board of Elections to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 18 2020Waiver of right of respondent Potter County Board of Elections to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020Waiver of right of respondents Boards of Elections for Armstrong, Bedford, Blair, Centre, Columbia, Dauphin, Fayette, Huntingdon, Indiana, Lackawanna, Lawrence, Lebanon, Montour, Northumberland, Venango and York Counties to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 25 2020Waiver of Boards of Elections for Armstrong, Bedford, Blair, Centre, Columbia, Dauphin, Fayette, Huntingdon, Indiana, Lackawanna, Lawrence, Lebanon, Montour, Northumberland, Venango and York Counties of right to respond not accepted for filing. (December 01, 2020)
Nov 30 2020Brief of respondent Pennsylvania Democratic Party in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Brief of respondent Luzerne County Board of Elections in opposition filed. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2020Motion to Intervene as Respondent filed by Thomas J. Randolph and C.F. Canavan. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by White House Watch Fund a project of United States Public Policy Council, et al.
Main Document
Nov 30 2020Brief of respondent Secretary of State Kathy Boockvar in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2020Brief of Thomas J. Randolph and C.F. Canavan in opposition not accepted for filing. (December 03, 2020)
Dec 14 2020Reply of petitioners Joseph B. Scarnati, III, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 07 2021Waiver of right of respondent Allegheny County Board of Elections to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Matthew Gore
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

jmgore@jonesday.com
2028793939
Party name: Republican Party of Pennsylvania
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

Jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Joseph B. Scarnati, III, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph Matthias Cosgrove
    Counsel of Record
Selingo Guagliardo LLC
345 Market Street
Kingston, PA 18704-0000

jmcosgro@msn.com
570-287-2400
Party name: Luzerne County Board of Elections
John Bartley DeLone
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General -Appellate Litigation Section
15th Floor, Strawberry Square
Harrisburg, PA 17120

jdelone@attorneygeneral.gov
717-712-3818
Party name: Secretary of State Kathy Boockvar
Gerard Joseph Geiger
    Counsel of Record
Newman, Williams, et al.
712 Monroe St.
P.O. Box 511
Stroudsburg, PA 18360

ggeiger@newmanwilliams.com
(570) 421-9090
Party name: Carbon County Board of Elections, Monroe County Board of Elections, Pike County Board of Elections, Wayne County Board of Elections, Schuylkill County Board of Elections
Molly Elizabeth Meacham
    Counsel of Record
Babst Calland Clements and Zomnir, PC
Two Gateway Center, 603 Stanwix Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

mmeacham@babstcalland.com
4126008528
Party name: Boards of Elections for Armstrong, Bedford, Blair, Centre, Columbia, Dauphin, Fayette, Huntingdon, Indiana, Lackawanna, Lawrence, Lebanon, Montour, Northumberland, Venango and York Counties
Molly Ruth Mudd
    Counsel of Record
Adams County Solicitor's Office
117 Baltimore Street
Gettysburg, PA 17325

mmudd@adamscounty.us
7173375911
Party name: Adams County Board of Elections
Allan Joseph Opsitnick
    Counsel of Record
564 Forbes Avenue
Suite 1301
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

aopsitnick@opsitnickslaw.com
4123913299
Party name: Allegheny County Board of Elections
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Pennsylvania Democratic Party
Stephanie L. FeraCafardi Ferguson Wyrick Weis & Gabriel, LLC
2605 Nicholson Road, Suite 2201
Sewickley, PA 15143

412-515-8900
Party name: Clarion County Board of Elections/Tioga County Board of Elections
Thomas R ShafferGlassmire and Shaffer Law Offices, P.C.
5 East Third Street
Coudersport, PA 16915

814-874-7292
Party name: Potter County Board of Elections
Other
David William Telford Carroll
    Counsel of Record
Carroll, Ucker & Hemmer, LLC
1955 Coventry Rd
Columbus, OH 43212-1015

dcarroll@cuhlaw.com
614-423-9820
Party name: White House Watch Fund a project of United States Public Policy Council
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: State of Ohio
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Helen Augusta Randolph
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 17416
2043 Wilson Boulevard
Arlington, VA 22216

hrlaw302907@gmail.com
3029079831
Party name: Thomas J. Randolph and C.F. Canavan
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: State of Missouri
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Litigation and Advocacy Group, P.C.
1700 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

jsekulow@claglaw.com
2025468890
Party name: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543