SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-5570 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-5570 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Richard Bernard Moore, Petitioner
v.
Bryan P. Stirling, Director, South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:
September 2, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-4)
Decision Date:
March 3, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
March 31, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 2, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 28 2020
Brief of respondents Bryan Stirling, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 02 2020
Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 02 2020
Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts and Habeas Professors filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 13 2020
Reply of petitioner Richard Moore filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 15 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Nov 02 2020
Petition DENIED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lindsey Sterling Vann
Counsel of Record
Justice 360
900 Elmwood Ave., Suite 200
Columbia, SC 29201
lindsey@justice360sc.org
8037651044
Party name: Richard Moore
Attorneys for Respondents
William Edgar Salter III
Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
P.O.Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211
esalter@scag.gov
803-734-6305
Party name: Bryan Stirling, et al.
Other
Caitlin Joan Halligan
Counsel of Record
Selendy & Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104
challigan@selendygay.com
(212) 390-9000
Party name: Federal Courts and Habeas Professors
Jonathan L. Marcus
Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005
jonathan.marcus@skadden.com
202-371-7596
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##