Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5398 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5398 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Lezmond Charles Mitchell, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 18, 2020
Linked with 20A30
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-17031)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 17, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 19 2020Application (20A30) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Reply of petitioner Lezmond Charles Mitchell filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2020Application (20A30) referred to the Court.
Aug 25 2020Petition DENIED.
Aug 25 2020Application (20A30) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Celeste Bacchi
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
321 East 2nd Street
Los Angeles, CA 90012

celeste_bacchi@fd.org
213-894-1887
Party name: Lezmond Charles Mitchell
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543