Docket for 20-5375 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 12 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 16, 2020) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 09 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2020 to October 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 11 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 16, 2020. | | | Oct 16 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 16, 2020 to January 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 19 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 19, 2021. | | | Jan 15 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2021 to February 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 15 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 5, 2021. | | | Feb 05 2021 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 22 2021 | Reply of petitioner Charles Hall filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Feb 25 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021. | | | Mar 22 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|