Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-512
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-512
Vide 20-520
Title:National Collegiate Athletic Association, Petitioner
v.
Shawne Alston, et al.
Docketed:October 19, 2020
Linked with 20A145
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15566, 19-15662)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2020Brief of respondents Shawne Alston, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Sam C. Ehrlich filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Law And Business School Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Economists filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Nov 24 2020Reply of petitioner National Collegiate Athletic Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-520 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 16 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-512. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-512. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Dec 21 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners National Collegiate Athletic Association. VIDED.
Main Document
Jan 04 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, National Collegiate Athletic Association
Blanket Consent
Jan 08 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Shawne Alston, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 11 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED. VIDED.
Jan 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Sam C. Ehrlich in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 31, 2021. VIDED.
Feb 01 2021Brief of petitioner National Collegiate Athletic Association filed (in 20-512).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021Brief of petitioners American Athletic Conference, et al. filed (in 20-520).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Feb 04 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer. Part of the record is SEALED and has been electronically filed.
Feb 05 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The Big Ten Conference, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Federation Of State High School Associations filed (in 20-512).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of American Council on Education and Ten Other Higher Education Associations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Thomas B. Nachbar filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Law And Business School Professors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Economists filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Georgia, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Student-Athletes filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2021Application (20A145) to extend the time to file the reply briefs on the merits from 2 p.m., March 19, 2021 to 2 p.m., March 21, 2021, submitted to Justice Kagan. VIDED.
Main Document
Feb 22 2021CIRCULATED.
Feb 24 2021Application (20A145) denied by Justice Kagan. VIDED.
Mar 03 2021Brief of respondents Shawne Alston, et al. filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2021Brief amici curiae of 65 Professors of Law, Business, Economics, and Sports Management filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 10 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Advocates for Minor Leaguers filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Historians filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Sports Economists filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Former NCAA Executives filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of African American Antitrust Lawyers filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Antitrust Institute filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Dr. Ellen J. Staurowsky, Dr. Eddie Comeaux, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of O'Bannon Plaintiff Class Representatives filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Players Associations of the National Football League, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Open Markets Institute, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Committee to Support the Antitrust Laws filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. VIDED.
Mar 19 2021Reply of petitioner National Collegiate Athletic Association filed (in 20-512). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2021Reply of petitioner The Big Ten Conference, Inc. filed (in 20-520). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Argued. For petitioners: Seth P. Waxman, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Jeffrey L. Kessler, New York, N. Y.; and Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Big Ten Conference, Inc.
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Attorneys for Respondents
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
312-558-8768
Party name: Shawne Alston, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Tillman J. Breckenridge
    Counsel of Record
Breckenridge PLLC
1325 G St, NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

tjb@breckenridgepllc.com
2025677733
Party name: African American Antitrust Lawyers
Michael Shawn Catlett
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General's Office, Office of the Solicitor General
2005 N. Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004

michael.catlett@azag.gov
(602)542-7751
Party name: Arizona, et al.
Mark Simon Davies
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Columbia Center
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mark.davies@orrick.com
202-339-8631
Party name: Former Student-Athletes
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: American Council on Education and Ten Other Higher Education Associations
Lisa Marie Geary
    Counsel of Record
RMP LLP
5519 Hackett Road
Suite 300
Springdale, AR 72762

lgeary@rmp.law
(479) 443-2705
Party name: 65 Professors of Law, Business, Economics, and Sports Management
Jay L. Himes
    Counsel of Record
Labaton Sucharow, LLP
140 Broadway
New York, NY 10005

jhimes@labaton.com
212-907-0834
Party name: Open Markets Institute, et al.
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Historians
Robert Samuel Kitchenoff
    Counsel of Record
Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher LLC
150 Monument Road, Suite 107
Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

kitchenoff@wka-law.com
2155457200
Party name: The Committee to Support the Antitrust Laws
Jonathan S. Massey
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail LLP
1000 Maine Avenue SW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024

jmassey@masseygail.com
202-652-4511
Party name: O'Bannon Plaintiff Class Representatives
Anita M. Moorman
    Counsel of Record
Sport Administration Program, Univ. of Louisville
SAC East, Suite 104R
Louisville, KY 40292

amm@louisville.edu
5028520553
Party name: Sam C. Ehrlich
Thomas Benjamin Nachbar
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

tnachbar@law.virginia.edu
4349247588
Party name: Thomas B. Nachbar
Bruce Davidson Oakley
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
609 Main Street
Suite 4200
Houston, TX 77002-2781

Bruce.Oakley@hoganlovells.com
(713) 632-1420
Party name: Antitrust Economists
Jack Edward Pace III
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

jpace@whitecase.com
(212) 819-8200
Party name: Antitrust Law And Business School Professors
Andrew Alan Pinson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Georgia Attorney General
40 Capital Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

apinson@law.ga.gov
404-458-3409
Party name: Georgia, et al.
James W. Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Berg & Androphy
120 West 45th Street
38th Floor
New York, NY 10036

jquinn@bafirm.com
6467660073
Party name: Former NCAA Executives
Seth Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
600 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

sarosenthal@venable.com
(202) 344-4000
Party name: Dr. Ellen J. Staurowsky, Dr. Eddie Comeaux, et al.
Andrew Arthur Schmidt
    Counsel of Record
Towards Justice
2840 Fairfax Street
Suite 220
Denver, CO 80207

andy@maineworkerjustice.com
(720) 441-2236
Party name: Advocates for Minor Leaguers
Randy M. Stutz
    Counsel of Record
American Antitrust Institute
1025 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

rstutz@antitrustinstitute.org
2029055420
Party name: American Antitrust Institute
Yen-Shyang Tseng
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Ave.
8th Fl.
Burbank, CA 91505

ytseng@horvitzlevy.com
818-995-0800
Party name: National Federation Of State High School Associations
Andrew S. Tulumello
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

atulumello@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8657
Party name: Players Associations of the National Football League, et al.
Daniel John Walker
    Counsel of Record
Berger Montague PC
2001 Pennsylvania Ave., Suite 300
Washington, DC 20912

dwalker@bm.net
202-559-9745
Party name: Sports Economists

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543