Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-331
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-331
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, Petitioner
v.
District of Columbia, et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2486)
   Decision Date:May 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Oct 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 14, 2020 to November 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 30, 2020. See Rule 30.1.
Oct 14 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and the Judicial Education Project.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 30, 2020 to December 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including December 14, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: In Re Donald J.Trump
Attorneys for Respondent
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Solicitor General
600 4th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: District of Columbia and the State of Maryland
Other
Robert W. Ray
    Counsel of Record
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
1211 Avenue of the Americas
40th Floor
New York, NY 10036

rray@zeklaw.com
2128265321
Party name: Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and the Judicial Education Project

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543