SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-240 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-240 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Kentucky, Petitioner
v.
Larry Lamont White
Docketed:
August 28, 2020
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Kentucky
Case Numbers:
(2014-SC-000725-MR)
Decision Date:
March 26, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 24 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 17 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2020 to October 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 18 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 28, 2020.
Sep 28 2020
Brief amici curiae of The States of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 27 2020
Brief of respondent Larry Lamont White in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Other
Other
Other
Nov 09 2020
Reply of petitioner Commonwealth of Kentucky filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Nov 10 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Franklin Kuhn
Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General of Kentucky
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601
matt.kuhn@ky.gov
(502) 696-5300
Party name: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Attorneys for Respondent
Kathleen Kallaher Schmidt
Counsel of Record
Department of Public Advocacy
5 Mill Creek Park, Suite 100
Frankfort, KY 40601
kathleen.schmidt@ky.gov
5025648006
Party name: Larry Lamont White
Other
Lacey Stover Gard
Counsel of Record
Office of the Arizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004
lacey.gard@azag.gov
6025425025
Party name: The States of Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Nebraska, Ohio, South Dakota, and Texas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##