Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1573
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1573
Title:Viking River Cruises, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Angie Moriana
Docketed:May 13, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B297327)
   Decision Date:September 18, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 9, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 14, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jun 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of California New Car Dealers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Restaurant Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 13 2021Response Requested. (Due August 12, 2021)
Aug 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 12, 2021 to September 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 10, 2021.
Sep 10 2021Brief of respondent Angie Moriana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Reply of petitioner Viking River Cruises, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kevin T. BarnesLaw Offices of Kevin T. Barnes
1635 Pontius Avenue, Second Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90025-3361

barnes@kbarnes.com
323-302-9675
Party name: Angie Moriana
Other
Peder K. Batalden
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Ave.
8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505

pbatalden@horvitzlevy.com
818-995-0800
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: California New Car Dealers Association
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Todd Brian Scherwin
    Counsel of Record
Fisher & Phillips LLP
621 Captiol Mall
Suite 1400
Sacramento, CA 95814

tscherwin@fisherphillips.com
(916) 210-0400
Party name: Restaurant Law Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543