Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1530
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1530
Vide 20-1531, 20-1778, 20-1780
Title:West Virginia, et al., Petitioners
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:May 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, State of West Virginia, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2021 to July 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2021, for all respondents.
May 28 2021Brief of respondent National Mining Association in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2021Brief of respondent Basin Electric Power Cooperative in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth of Kentucky filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2021Brief of respondent America's Power in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 6, 2021 to August 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 5, 2021, for all respondents.
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents States and Municipalities in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2021Reply of petitioners State of West Virginia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 29 2021Petition GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari in No. 20-1531 and No. 20-1780 are granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-1778 is granted limited to Question 2 presented by the petition. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The motion of Lignite Energy Council for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae is granted. VIDED.
Nov 04 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-1530. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-1530. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Nov 10 2021Blanket Consent filed by petitioners, State of West Virginia, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 10 2021Blanket Consent filed by petitioner, North American Coal Corporation in No. 20-1531. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 10 2021Blanket Consent filed by petitioner, Westmoreland Minings Holdings LLC in No. 20-1778. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 24 2021Blanket Consent filed by respondent, America's Power in support. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 24 2021Blanket Consent filed by respondent, National Mining Association in support. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 24 2021Blanket Consent filed by respondent, Basin Electric Power Cooperative in support. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 24 2021Motion of Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (December 03, 2021)
Nov 26 2021Motion of respondents for an extension of time filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Nov 29 2021Blanket Consent filed by respondent, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 29 2021Blanket Consent filed by petitioner, North Dakota in No. 20-1780. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Nov 30 2021Blanket Consent filed by respondent, Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association respondents. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Dec 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file the response briefs on the merits is granted and the time is extended to and including January 18, 2022. VIDED.
Dec 06 2021Blanket Consent filed by respondents, States and Municipalities in opposition. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Dec 13 2021Joint appendix filed (4 volumes). VIDED. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 13 2021Brief of petitioners West Virginia, et al. filed (in 20-1530).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2021Brief of petitioner The North American Coal Corporation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2021Brief of petitioner Westmoreland Minings Holdings LLC filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2021Brief of petitioner The State North Dakota filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2021Brief of respondent National Mining Association in support filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2021Brief of respondent Basin Electric Power Cooperative in support filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2021Brief of respondent America's Power filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed. (in 20-1530)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2021Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2021Brief amici curiae of Lignite Energy Council, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, February 28, 2022. VIDED.
Dec 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2021Brief amici curiae of South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Congressional Accountability in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Buckeye Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of America First Policy Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Michigan House of Representatives, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2021Brief amici curiae of 91 Members of Congress filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Kentucky, et al. filed. (in 20-1530)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Doctors for Disaster Preparedness, et al. filed. (in 20-1530)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance (Dec. 30, 2021) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit.
Dec 23 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer. The oral argument transcript has been electronically filed.
Dec 30 2021Amicus brief of New Civil Liberties Alliance not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted)(January 05, 2022)
Jan 18 2022CIRCULATED
Jan 18 2022Brief of Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association respondents filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Brief of State of New York, and Other State and Municipal respondents filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Brief of Federal respondents filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Brief of Power Company respondents filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed by West Virginia, et al. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed by North Dakota. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed by the Solicitor General. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 19 2022Letter of respondent Commonwealth of Virginia filed (Revised letter of 2/18/22). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jan 24 2022Motion of West Virginia, et al. for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument granted in part, and the time is allotted as follows: 20 minutes for the state petitioners, 15 minutes for the private petitioners, 20 minutes for the federal respondents, and 15 minutes for the power company respondents. VIDED.
Jan 24 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument granted in part, and the time is allotted as follows: 20 minutes for the state petitioners, 15 minutes for the private petitioners, 20 minutes for the federal respondents, and 15 minutes for the power company respondents. VIDED.
Jan 24 2022Motion of North Dakota for divided argument and for enlargement of time for oral argument DENIED. VIDED.
Jan 24 2022Brief amici curiae of Climate Scientists Michael Oppenheimer, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senators Sheldon Whitehouse, et al. filed (in 20-1530). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of Thomas C. Jorling filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amici curiae of The National League of Cities and The U.S. Conference of Mayors filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amici curiae of American Thoracic Society, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 25 2022Brief amici curiae of 192 Members of Congress filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Richard L. Revesz filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Commissioners of the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amici curiae of The Edison Electric Institute and The National Association of Clean Water Agencies filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Apple Inc., et al., filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Julian Davis Mortenson filed (in 20-1530). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Power Industry Executives filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amici curiae of Grid Experts Benjamin F. Hobbs, et al. filed (in 20-1530). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Parks Conservation Association filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2022Update to Amended Corporate Disclosure Statements in the Power company respondents brief on the merits filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 16 2022Reply of respondent Basin Electric Power Cooperative filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2022Reply of petitioner The North American Coal Corporation filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2022Reply of petitioner Westmoreland Minings Holdings LLC in No. 20-1778 filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2022Reply of petitioner The State North Dakota in No. 20-1780 filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2022Reply of petitioners State of West Virginia, et al. filed (in 20-1530). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2022Argued. For state petitioners: Lindsay S. See, Solicitor General, Charleston, W. Va. For private petitioners: Jacob M. Roth, Washington, D. C. For federal respondents: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For power company respondents: Beth S. Brinkmann, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Westmoreland Minings Holdings LLC in No. 20-1778
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
202-879-7658
Party name: The North American Coal Corporation
Paul Martin Seby
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
1144 15th Street
Suite 3300
Denver, CO 80202

sebyp@gtlaw.com
303-572-6500
Party name: North Dakota in No. 20-1780
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: West Virginia, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District
Sean Hoe Donahue
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg & Littleton
1008 Pennsylvania Avenue, SE
Washington, DC 20003

sean@donahuegoldberg.com
2022777085
Party name: Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents
Andrew Nathan Ferguson
    Counsel of Record
Virginia Office of the Attorney General
202 North 9th St.
Richmond, VA 23219

AFerguson@oag.state.va.us
8047867704
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: America's Power in support
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Emily Church Schilling
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart LLP
901 K Street NW Suite 850
Washington, DC 20001

ecschilling@hollandhart.com
2023936500
Party name: Basin Electric Power Cooperative in support
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe St.
Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(608) 999-1240
Party name: National Mining Association
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: State of New York, States and Municipalities
Steven Chiajon WuNew York Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005

steven.wu@ag.ny.gov
2124166312
Party name: New York
Other
H. Christopher Bartolomucci
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

cbartolomucci@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: The Michigan House of Representatives, The Michigan Senate
Jeffrey Steven Beelaert
    Counsel of Record
Stein Mitchell Beato & Missner LLP
901 15th Street NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20005

jbeelaert@steinmitchell.com
(202) 737-7777
Party name: 91 Members of Congress
Jonathan Andrew Berry
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates
801 17th St. NW Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

berry@boydengrayassociates.com
2028095613
Party name: The America First Policy Institute
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Apple Inc., et al.,
Michael Harlan Burger
    Counsel of Record
Sabin Center for Climate Change Law
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027

michael.burger@law.columbia.edu
(212) 854-2372
Party name: The National League of Cities and The U.S, Conference of Mayors.
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad St., Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
(614) 244-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Law Building
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: U.S. Senators Sheldon Whitehouse, Richard Blumenthal, Bernie Sanders, and Elizabeth Warren as Amici Curiae in Support of Respondents
Sara Anita Colangelo
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

sac54@law.georgetown.edu
2026616543
Party name: Public Health Organizations & Public Health School Leaders
Agatha Marie Cole
    Counsel of Record
Pollock Cohen LLP
60 Broad Street
24th Floor
New York, NY 10004

agatha@pollockcohen.com
8287732628
Party name: 192 Members of Congress
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Julian Davis Mortenson
Ruth Merewyn Greenwood
    Counsel of Record
Election Law Clinic, Harvard Law School
6 Everett St, Suite 5112
Cambridge, MA 02138

rgreenwood@law.harvard.edu
2025600590
Party name: Scholars of Congressional Accountability
Sean Bernard Hecht
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
405 Hilgard Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90095

hecht@law.ucla.edu
3107945272
Party name: Thomas C. Jorling
Cara A. Horowitz
    Counsel of Record
Frank G. Wells Clinic, UCLA School of Law
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

horowitz.elc@law.ucla.edu
3102064033
Party name: Grid Experts Benjamin F. Hobbs, Brendan Kirby, Kenneth J. Lutz, and James D. McCalley
Sam Kazman
    Counsel of Record
1310 L Street, N.W.
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

sam.kazman@cei.org
(202) 331-1010
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute
Paul Robert Koster
    Counsel of Record
Emory Law School Supreme Court Advocacy Program
1301 Clifton Road
Atlanta, GA 30322

paul.koster@emory.edu
4047273957
Party name: National Parks Conservation Association
Thomas Allen Lorenzen
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

tlorenzen@crowell.com
202-624-2500
Party name: The Edison Electric Institute and The National Association of Clean Water Agencies
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Stephen Chad MeredithOffice of the Kentucky Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

chad.meredith@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Michael John Nasi
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Walker L.L.P.
100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1100
Austin, TX 78701

mnasi@jw.com
5122362216
Party name: South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Michael John Nasi
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Walker L.L.P.
100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1100
Austin, TX 78701

mnasi@jw.com
5122362216
Party name: Lignite Energy Council
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Brett Robert Nolan
    Counsel of Record
Kentucky Office of the Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

brett.nolan@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Commonwealth of Kentucky, et al.,
Michael James O'Neill
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Ave. Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

mike@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6105
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
John Pagliaro
    Counsel of Record
The New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111

JPagliaro@nelfonline.org
617-695-3660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Matthew Eben Price
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave. NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MPrice@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Former Power Industry Executives
Richard L. Revesz
    Counsel of Record
New York University
School of Law
40 Washington Square South
New York, NY 10012-0000

richard.revesz@nyu.edu
212-998-6185
Party name: Richard L. Revesz
Stephen E. Roady
    Counsel of Record
Duke University School of Law
210 Science Drive
Box 90360
Durham, NC 27708

steve.roady@duke.edu
202 257 9114
Party name: Former Commissioners of the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Brian Rosner
    Counsel of Record
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC, DC 20036

BRosner1517@gmail.com
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Doctors for Disaster Preparedness, et al.,
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Thomas Gregory Sprankling
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2600 El Camino Real, Suite 400
Palo Alto, CA 94306

Thomas.Sprankling@wilmerhale.com
650-858-6062
Party name: Climate Scientists Michael Oppenheimer, Noah Diffenbaugh, Christopher Field, Stephen Pacala, Daniel Schrag, and Susan Solomon

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543