Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1499
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1499
Title:American Civil Liberties Union, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 27, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court of Review
   Case Numbers:(Misc. 20-02)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 27, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 27, 2021 to June 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 28, 2021.
May 11 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, American Civil Liberties Union
Blanket Consent
May 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Former United States Magistrate Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2021Brief amici curiae of The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law and Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Microsoft Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor Stephen I. Vladeck filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 34 Media Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Project for Privacy & Surveillance Accountability filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2021Amicus brief of Former Government Officials submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2021 to July 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 28, 2021.
Jul 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 28, 2021 to August 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 27, 2021.
Aug 27 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 14 2021Reply of petitioner American Civil Liberties Union filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8668
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Former United States Magistrate Judges
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th St NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 34 Media Organizations
Laura Rose Handman
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1301 K Street, N.W.
Suite 500 East
Washington, DC 20005

laurahandman@dwt.com
202-973-4200
Party name: The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law and Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Sean Hecker
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Heckler & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue
Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

shecker@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: Former Government Officials
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Project for Privacy & Surveillance Accountability
Robert Mark Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

rloeb@orrick.com
202-339-8475
Party name: Microsoft Corporation
Brian Michael Willen
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10019-6022

bwillen@wsgr.com
(212) 999-5800
Party name: Professor Stephen I. Vladeck

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543