Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1410
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1410
Title:Xiulu Ruan, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-12653)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 4, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 7, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 7, 2021 to June 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 7, 2021.
May 07 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors of Health Law and Policy filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 7, 2021 to July 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 7, 2021.
Jul 07 2021Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jul 20 2021Reply of petitioner Xiulu Ruan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 05 2021Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 21-5261 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Nov 05 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-1410. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-1410. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Dec 08 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Xiulu Ruan
Blanket Consent
Dec 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, March 1, 2022. VIDED.
Dec 17 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed (in 20-1410).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief of petitioner Xiulu Ruan filed (in 20-1410).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Joint appendix filed (in 20-1410). (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 20 2021Joint appendix filed (in 21-5261). (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Brief of petitioner Shakeel Kahn filed (in 21-5261).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Dec 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Compassion & Choices filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021The record from the U.S.C.A 11th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer
Dec 23 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors of Health Law and Policy filed (in 20-1410).
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Amicus brief of Physicians Against Abuse not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted - February 15, 2022).
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Physicians Against Abuse filed (in 20-1410) (1/15/2022). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Due Process Institute filed (in 20-1410).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed (in 20-1410).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons and Jeffrey A. Singer, M.D. filed (in 20-1410).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Pain Advocacy Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Chain Drug Stores in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Anmol Singh Kamra filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Stephen J. Ziegler, et al. filed (in 20-1410).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2022CIRCULATED
Jan 19 2022Brief of respondent United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Motion for divided argument filed by petitioners. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Feb 17 2022Reply of petitioner Shakeel Kahn filed (in 21-5261). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2022Motion for divided argument filed by petitioners GRANTED, and the time is divided as follows: 15 minutes for petitioner in in No. 20-1410 and 15 minutes for petitioner in No. 21-5261. VIDED.
Feb 18 2022Reply of petitioner Xiulu Ruan filed (in 20-1410). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Argued. For petitioner in 20-1410: Lawrence S. Robbins, Washington, D. C. For petitioner in 21-5261: Beau B. Brindley, Chicago, Ill. For respondent: Eric J. Feigin, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Beau B. Brindley
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Beau B. Brindley
53 W. Jackson Blvd.
Suite 1410
Chicago, IL 60604

bbbrindley@gmail.com
312-765-8878
Party name: Shakeel Kahn
Lawrence Saul Robbins
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Robbins Russell
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

lrobbins@kramerlevin.com
(202) 775-4501
Party name: Xiulu Ruan
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
H. Christopher Bartolomucci
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

cbartolomucci@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: National Pain Advocacy Center
Jeffrey Steven Beelaert
    Counsel of Record
Stein Mitchell Beato & Missner LLP
901 15th Street NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20005

jbeelaert@steinmitchell.com
(202) 737-7777
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Ronald William Chapman II
    Counsel of Record
Chapman Law Group
1441 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 310
Troy, MI 48098

rwchapman@chapmanlawgroup.com
248-644-6326
Party name: Stephen J. Ziegler, et al.
Trevor Stephen Cox
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
Riverfront Plaza - East Tower
951 East Byrd Street
Richmond, VA 23219

TCox@HuntonAK.com
8047887221
Party name: National Association of Chain Drug Stores
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Oliver James Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Boulevard
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

odunford@pacificlegal.org
916.503.9060
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Peter Goldberger
    Counsel of Record
50 Rittenhouse Place
Ardmore, PA 19003

peter.goldberger@verizon.net
610-649-8200
Party name: Anmol Singh Kamra
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

cneily@cato.org
2024257499
Party name: The Cato Institute
Sebastian Ohanian
    Counsel of Record
The Law Office of Sebastian Ohanian, LLC
1 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 1225
Coral Gables, FL 33134

sebastian@Ohanianlegal.com
7863695447
Party name: Physicians Against Abuse
Jennifer D. Oliva
    Counsel of Record
Seton Hall University School of Law
One Newark Center
Newark, NJ 07012

jennifer.oliva@shu.edu
9736428151
Party name: Professors of Health Law and Policy
Andrew Devin Prins
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

andrew.prins@lw.com
202-637-3317
Party name: Due Process Institute
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Association of American Physicians and Surgeons and Jeffrey A. Singer, M.D.
Steven M. Wilker
    Counsel of Record
Tonkon Torp LLP
888 SW Fifth Avenue
Suite 1600
Portland, OR 97204

steven.wilker@tonkon.com
5038022040
Party name: Compassion & Choices

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543