Docket for 20-1306 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 08 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2021) | | PetitionProof of Service | Apr 05 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2021 to May 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 06 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 19, 2021. | | | May 19 2021 | Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service | Jun 08 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021. | | | Jun 28 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|