SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-1246
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-1246
Title:
Anna Valentine, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Johnny Phillips
Docketed:
March 9, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-6184)
Decision Date:
September 1, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
October 9, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 11 2021
Waiver of right of respondent Johnny Phillips to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 16 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 29 2021
Response Requested. (Due April 28, 2021)
Apr 22 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 28, 2021 to May 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 23 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 28, 2021.
Apr 26 2021
Supplemental brief of petitioner Anna Valentine filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 28 2021
Brief of respondent Johnny Phillips in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jun 16 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Courtney J. Hightower
Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
1024 Capital Center Drive
Frankfort, KY 40601-8204
courtney.hightower@ky.gov
5026965513
Party name: Anna Valentine
Attorneys for Respondent
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007
alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 937-7294
Party name: Johnny Phillips
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##