Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-107
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-107
Title:Cedar Point Nursery, et al., Petitioners
v.
Victoria Hassid, et al.
Docketed:August 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16321)
   Decision Date:May 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 29, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Cedar Point Nursery, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 2, 2020 to October 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 2, 2020.
Aug 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of California Farm Bureau Federation filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief amicus curiae of Pelican Institute for Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Farm Bureau Federation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Wencong Fa
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

wfa@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Cedar Point Nursery, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

josh.patashnik@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3896
Party name: Victoria Hassid, et al.
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles LLP
4470 W. Sunset Blvd.
Suite 93165
Los Angeles, CA 90027

paul.beard@fisherbroyles.com
818-216-3988
Party name: American Farm Bureau Federation
Carl Gale Borden
    Counsel of Record
2600 River Plaza Dr
Sacramento, CA 95833

cborden@cfbf.com
9165615659
Party name: California Farm Bureau Federation
Bryan Gregg Cleveland
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General's Office
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

bryan.cleveland@oag.ok.gov
(405) 521-3921
Party name: State of Oklahoma, et al.
Timothy Vartkes Kassouni
    Counsel of Record
Kassouni Law
621 Capitol Mall
Suite 2025
Sacramento, CA 95814

timothy@kassounilaw.com
9169300030
Party name: Pelican Institute for Public Policy
Jeffrey Hallett Redfern
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jredfern@ij.org
6123081084
Party name: Institute for Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI 96813-0000

rht@hawaiilawyer.com
808-531-8031
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Cristen Alice Wohlgemuth
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

cristen@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543