SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19A893 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19A893 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Mitchell Willoughby, Applicant
v.
Deedra Hart, Warden
Docketed:
February 11, 2020
Linked with 19-8335
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(14-6505)
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2020
Application (19A893) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 17, 2020 to April 17, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Feb 14 2020
Application (19A893) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 17, 2020.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dennis James Burke
Counsel of Record
Commonwealth of Kentucky, Department of Public Adv
2202 Commerce Drive
Suite D
LaGrange, KY 40031
dennis.burke@ky.gov
502-564-4819
Party name: Mitchell Willoughby
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##