Docket for 19A642 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 06 2019 | Application (19A642) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2019 to February 23, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 17 2019 | Application (19A642) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 24, 2020. | | |
|