Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A123
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A123
Title:Kevin W. Culp, et al., Applicants
v.
Kwame Raoul, Attorney General of Illinois, et al.
Docketed:July 30, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2998)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2019Application (19A123) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 11, 2019 to October 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Jul 31 2019Application (19A123) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until October 10, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David G. Sigale
    Counsel of Record
Law Firm of David G. Sigale, P.C.
799 Roosevelt Road
Suite 207
Glen Ellyn, IL 60137

dsigale@sigalelaw.com
6304524547
Party name: Kevin Culp, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543