Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A1063
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A1063
Title:John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al., Applicants
v.
People First of Alabama, et al.
Docketed:June 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-12184)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2020Application (19A1063) for a stay, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 30 2020Response to application (19A1063) requested by Justice Thomas, due Thursday, July 2, by noon.
Jul 02 2020Response to application from respondents People First of Alabama, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jul 02 2020Reply of applicants John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jul 02 2020Application (19A1063) referred to the Court.
Jul 02 2020Application (19A1063) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Thomas and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the district court’s June 15, 2020 order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Ginsburg, Justice Breyer, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would deny the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-353-2196
Party name: John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Natasha Clarise Merle
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

nmerle@naacpldf.org
212-965-2200
Party name: People First of Alabama, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543