Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A1044
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A1044
Title:South Bay United Pentecostal Church, et al., Applicants
v.
Gavin Newsom, Governor of California, et al.
Docketed:May 26, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-55533)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 26 2020Application (19A1044) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 26 2020Supplemental brief of applicants South Bay United Pentecostal Church, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 27 2020Response to application (19A1044) requested by Justice Kagan, due Thursday, May 28, by 8 p.m. ET/5 p.m. PT.
May 27 2020Notice of New County Order Relevant to Plaintiffs' Emergency Application for Writ of Injunction of Wilma J. Wooten, Public Health Officer, County of San Diego; Helen Robbins-Meyer, Director of Emergency Services; and William D. Gore, Sheriff of the County of San Diego not accepted for filing. (May 28, 2020)
May 28 2020Response to application from respondents Wilma J. Wooten, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 28 2020Response to application from respondents Gavin Newsom, Governor of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 29 2020Reply of applicants South Bay United Pentecostal Church, et al. filed.
Reply
May 30 2020Application (19A1044) referred to the Court.
May 30 2020Application (19A1044) denied by the Court. JUSTICE THOMAS, JUSTICE ALITO, JUSTICE GORSUCH, and JUSTICE KAVANAUGH would grant the application. CHIEF JUSTICE ROBERTS, concurring in denial of application for injunctive relief. JUSTICE KAVANAUGH, with whom JUSTICE THOMAS and JUSTICE GORSUCH join, dissenting from denial of application for injunctive relief. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles S. LiMandri
    Counsel of Record
LiMandri & Jonna LLP
P.O. Box 9120
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

cslimandri@limandri.com
858-759-9930
Party name: South Bay United Pentecostal Church, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Solicitor General
455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: Gavin Newsom, Governor of California; Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California; and Sonia Angell, California Public Health Officer
Jeffrey Patrick Michalowski
    Counsel of Record
Office of County Counsel, County of San Diego
1600 Pacific Highway, Suite 355
San Diego, CA 92101

jeffrey.michalowski@sdcounty.ca.gov
(619) 531-4886
Party name: Wilma J. Wooten, Public Health Officer, County of San Diego; Helen Robbins-Meyer, Director of Emergency Services; and William D. Gore, Sheriff of the County of San Diego

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543