Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19A1016
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19A1016
Title:Republican National Committee, et al., Applicants
v.
Democratic National Committee, et al.
Docketed:April 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1538, 20-1546, 20-1539, 20-1545)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2020Application (19A1016) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 04 2020Response to application due on or before 2 p.m. ET, Sunday, April 5, 2020.
Apr 05 2020Response to application from respondents Democratic National Committee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 05 2020Reply of applicant Republican National Committee, et al. filed.
ReplyReply
Apr 06 2020Application (19A1016) referred to the Court.
Apr 06 2020Application (19A1016) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to JUSTICE KAVANAUGH and by him referred to the Court is granted. The District Court’s order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed to the extent it requires the State to count absentee ballots postmarked after April 7, 2020. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE GINSBURG, with whom JUSTICE BREYER, JUSTICE SOTOMAYOR, and JUSTICE KAGAN join, dissenting. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
2075223163
Party name: Republican National Committee, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Marc Erik Elias
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Cole, LLP
700 13th St, NW
Ste. 800
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1609
Party name: Democratic National Committee, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543