Docket for 19-988
|
Dec 10 2019 | Application (19A646) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2020 to February 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 10 2019 | Application (19A646) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 3, 2020. | | | Feb 03 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2020) | | PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 12 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent State of Washington to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 19 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020. | | | Feb 27 2020 | Response Requested. (Due March 30, 2020) | | | Feb 28 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Robert M McKenna and Michael C Turpen filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 06 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to May 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 10 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 29, 2020. | | | Mar 11 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute; Cato Institute; Reason Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 27 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 27 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 30 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Kentucky, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 05 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2020 to June 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 06 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 29, 2020. | | | Jun 29 2020 | Brief of respondent State of Washington in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 13 2020 | Reply of petitioners Living Essentials, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 15 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|