Docket for 19-953
|
Nov 13 2019 | Application (19A587) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2019 to January 26, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 26 2019 | Application (19A587) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 27, 2020. | | | Jan 27 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 26 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 2, 2020 to May 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 02 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2020. | | | Apr 22 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Dean Williams, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 28 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020. | | | May 04 2020 | Response Requested. (Due June 3, 2020) | | | Jun 03 2020 | Brief of respondents Dean Williams, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 17 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Jun 17 2020 | Reply of petitioner Charles Farrar filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|