Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-926
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-926
Title:Kim Davis, Petitioner
v.
David Ermold, et al.
Docketed:January 24, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-6119, 17-6120, 17-6226, 17-6233)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 24, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 22 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2020Waiver of right of respondent David Ermold and David Moore to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 28 2020Waiver of right of respondents James Yates and Will Smith to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Feb 12 2020Response Requested. (Due March 13, 2020)
Feb 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2020 to April 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 13, 2020, for all respondents.
Mar 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2020Brief of respondents David Ermold, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2020Brief of James Yates and Will Smith in opposition not accepted for filing. (April 28, 2020)( Duplicate submission)
Apr 23 2020Reply of petitioner Kim Davis filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 12 2020Rescheduled.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 20 2020Rescheduled.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
May 27 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
Jun 02 2020Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

mat@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Kim Davis
Attorneys for Respondents
Adam Ross Pulver
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th St. NW
Washington, DC 20009

apulver@citizen.org
202-588-7790
Party name: David Ermold and David Moore
Other
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543