SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-878
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-878
Title:
Guy Gentile, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:
January 15, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-1242)
Decision Date:
September 26, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2020)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 04 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2020 to March 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2020
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 16, 2020.
Mar 16 2020
Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 30 2020
Reply of petitioner Guy Gentile filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 01 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 20 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Caleb Ford
Counsel of Record
Ford O'Brien LLP
575 Fifth Ave Fl. 17
New York, NY 10017
aford@fordobrien.com
2128580040
Party name: Guy Gentile
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##