Docket for 19-8614 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 28 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 6, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Jul 06 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 6, 2020 to August 5, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 07 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 5, 2020. | | | Aug 03 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2020 to August 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 05 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 7, 2020. | | | Aug 07 2020 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 27 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|